NY S06192 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Excludes commercial motor vehicles with a seating capacity of nine or more persons from the definition of "sedan" and changes the license requirements to operate a limousine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excludes commercial motor vehicles with a seating capacity of nine or more persons from the definition of "sedan" and changes the license requirements to operate a limousine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1090
2019-05-21SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A08474 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback