NY S06193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the commissioner of transportation to impound or immobilize stretch limousines in certain situations; provides that such impounded motor vehicle shall not be released unless the commissioner of transportation is satisfied that repairs have been scheduled or been made to satisfactorily adjust such vehicle's out-of-service defect or defects; provides that release of such impounded vehicle without approval by such commissioner shall be punishable by a fine of up to ten thousand dollars; makes related provisions.
Title
Allows the commissioner of transportation to impound or immobilize stretch limousines in certain situations; provides that such impounded motor vehicle shall not be released unless the commissioner of transportation is satisfied that repairs have been scheduled or been made to satisfactorily adjust such vehicle's out-of-service defect or defects; provides that release of such impounded vehicle without approval by such commissioner shall be punishable by a fine of up to ten thousand dollars; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.9 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.81 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6193C |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.6 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | rules report cal.6 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-10 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9056 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.81 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6193C |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6193B |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED 6193A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1091 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08476 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
A08302 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
A09056 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.9
A08302 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
A09056 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.9