NY S06196 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Title
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.354 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.202 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7921 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.984 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07921 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.354