NY S06197 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to policies or contracts which are not included in the definition of student accident and health insurance.
Title
Relates to policies or contracts which are not included in the definition of student accident and health insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.92 |
2019-12-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.746 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a492 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.990 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00492 (Same As) 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92