NY S06199 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to loans by the housing trust fund corporation; provides that such loans may exceed the thirty year limit in instances where a lengthier period is necessary to provide for a loan term that is co-terminus with the terms of other financing or regulatory agencies participating in the project.
Title
Relates to loans by the housing trust fund corporation; provides that such loans may exceed the thirty year limit in instances where a lengthier period is necessary to provide for a loan term that is co-terminus with the terms of other financing or regulatory agencies participating in the project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2020-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.216 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1098 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08427 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means