NY S06212 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires blanket health insurance policies to provide coverage for outpatient treatment by mental health practitioners (mental health counsellors, marriage and family therapists, creative arts therapists and psychoanalysts) licensed pursuant to article 163 of the education law.
Title
Requires blanket health insurance policies to provide coverage for outpatient treatment by mental health practitioners (mental health counsellors, marriage and family therapists, creative arts therapists and psychoanalysts) licensed pursuant to article 163 of the education law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.171 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1786 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6212A |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.320 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.320 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-07 | Senate | print number 670a |
2019-06-07 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-06 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A670A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1786 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6212A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00670 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled