NY S06217 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - PRINT NUMBER 6217B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - PRINT NUMBER 6217B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes accidental disability retirement for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol and deputy sheriff patrol supervisors; provides that the annual retirement allowance payable upon accidental disability retirement shall be a pension of three-quarters of a member's final average salary.
Title
Establishes accidental disability retirement for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol and deputy sheriff patrol supervisors; provides that the annual retirement allowance payable upon accidental disability retirement shall be a pension of three-quarters of a member's final average salary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6217B |
2020-03-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6217A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07784 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees