NY S06222 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the court to consider the best interest of a companion animal when awarding possession in a divorce or separation proceeding.
Title
Relates to requiring the court to consider the best interest of a companion animal when awarding possession in a divorce or separation proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.611 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A01097 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary