NY S06224 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments of grants to farm operations by NYSERDA; provides that payment of such grants shall be made no later than ninety days after notification.
Title
Relates to payments of grants to farm operations by NYSERDA; provides that payment of such grants shall be made no later than ninety days after notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2014-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.72 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08977 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - referred to energy