NY S06224 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes towns and cities within Orange county in the definition of designated community for community preservation funds; authorizes the imposition of a real estate transfer tax.
Title
Includes towns and cities within Orange county in the definition of designated community for community preservation funds; authorizes the imposition of a real estate transfer tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.688 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6224B |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6224A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07699 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT