NY S06228 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain state land, Cedar Street Southbound Extension, to the city of New Rochelle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain state land, Cedar Street Southbound Extension, to the city of New Rochelle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.465
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7846a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1616
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 6228A
2019-06-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-24SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07846 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s6228a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback