NY S06229 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointees to the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation, and transportation of eligible persons residing in a rural area.
Title
Relates to the appointees to the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation, and transportation of eligible persons residing in a rural area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.357 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1365 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08107 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation