NY S06234 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the actual innocence justice act of 2010; clarifies that convicted persons who can demonstrate a reasonable probability that they are innocent will have the right to challenge their convictions under the law, notwithstanding any other procedural or technical provisions of law that would have prevented them from doing so.
Title
Establishes the actual innocence justice act of 2010; clarifies that convicted persons who can demonstrate a reasonable probability that they are innocent will have the right to challenge their convictions under the law, notwithstanding any other procedural or technical provisions of law that would have prevented them from doing so.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.840 | |
2010-05-28 | PRINT NUMBER 6234C | |
2010-05-28 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-05-18 | PRINT NUMBER 6234B | |
2010-05-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-02-03 | PRINT NUMBER 6234A | |
2010-02-03 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-10-19 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A9736 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - reported referred to rules