NY S06239 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authority of the New York black car operators' injury compensation fund, inc. to provide additional benefits, consistent with its plan of operation, for all black car operators.
Title
Relates to the authority of the New York black car operators' injury compensation fund, inc. to provide additional benefits, consistent with its plan of operation, for all black car operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.77 |
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.730 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.701 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8129a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6239A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1207 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08129 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.77