NY S06243 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to publish on the department of motor vehicle's website information to assist persons in determining whether a safety recall has been issued on motor vehicles and related equipment, child safety seats or tires.
Title
Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to publish on the department of motor vehicle's website information to assist persons in determining whether a safety recall has been issued on motor vehicles and related equipment, child safety seats or tires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Senate | signed chap.338 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1366 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6243 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.399 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | print number 3366a |
2019-05-16 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3366A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1366 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03366 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - signed chap.338