NY S06249 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the employee requirements for appraisal management companies.
Title
Clarifies the employee requirements for appraisal management companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.667 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1439 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6249 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.215 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8024 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1439 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08024 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - signed chap.667