NY S06255 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven to extend the boundaries of the Rocky Point fire district to include the village of Shoreham.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven to extend the boundaries of the Rocky Point fire district to include the village of Shoreham.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.355 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.522 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7983 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1705 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07983 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.355