NY S06266 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to minimum wage rates for covered airport workers.
Title
Relates to minimum wage rates for covered airport workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.76 |
2020-12-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.387 |
2020-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.174 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted for a8142e |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.789 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6266D |
2020-07-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6266C |
2020-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6266B |
2020-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-08-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6266A |
2019-08-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08142 (Same As) 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.76