NY S06285 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.334
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.334
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Amherst, county of Erie, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Amherst, county of Erie, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.334 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.632 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8340 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1707 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6285A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08340 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.334