NY S06288 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to annual reporting on substance use disorder in incarcerated individuals; requires the office of addiction services and supports to monitor programs providing treatment to incarcerated individuals in correctional facilities and provide an annual report.
Title
Relates to annual reporting on substance use disorder in incarcerated individuals; requires the office of addiction services and supports to monitor programs providing treatment to incarcerated individuals in correctional facilities and provide an annual report.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.183 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6288A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04943 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES