NY S06293 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes in the city of New York, for certain public work undertaken pursuant to project labor agreements, use of the alternative delivery method known as design-build contracts.
Title
Authorizes in the city of New York, for certain public work undertaken pursuant to project labor agreements, use of the alternative delivery method known as design-build contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.94 |
2019-12-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.749 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.511 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7636b |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1668 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6293A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07636 (Same As) 2019-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.94