NY S06295 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a moratorium on the annexation of agricultural land by certain localities for an industrial use for one year.
Title
Creates a moratorium on the annexation of agricultural land by certain localities for an industrial use for one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6295A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07808 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means