NY S06298 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 6298A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 6298A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the New York state school resource officer program for school districts outside of New York City; requires retired police officers be certified by the department of education to become school resource officers; allows retired police officers employed as school resource officers to carry a firearm on school grounds given an appropriate license; relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as a school resource officer.
Title
Creates the New York state school resource officer program for school districts outside of New York City; requires retired police officers be certified by the department of education to become school resource officers; allows retired police officers employed as school resource officers to carry a firearm on school grounds given an appropriate license; relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as a school resource officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6298A |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06456 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - print number 6456b