NY S06312 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the discontinuance of park land of a portion of subsurface real property in the city of New York and grants easements to the metropolitan transportation authority to enable the New York city transit authority to use such lands for the construction of a new subsurface electrical substation adjacent to the existing tunnel of the A, C, E subway lines to provide power to enable additional subway trains to be operated.
Title
Authorizes the discontinuance of park land of a portion of subsurface real property in the city of New York and grants easements to the metropolitan transportation authority to enable the New York city transit authority to use such lands for the construction of a new subsurface electrical substation adjacent to the existing tunnel of the A, C, E subway lines to provide power to enable additional subway trains to be operated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.308 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7772a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1620 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6312A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07772 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308