NY S06316 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirements for a license as a professional land surveyor.
Title
Relates to the requirements for a license as a professional land surveyor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.322 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1368 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6316 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.119 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.119 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Senate | print number 3937a |
2019-05-30 | Senate | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-01-31 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3937A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1368 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03937 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - signed chap.322