NY S06319 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates as peace officers, the uniformed court officers of the town court of the town of New Windsor.
Title
Designates as peace officers, the uniformed court officers of the town court of the town of New Windsor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.185 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.449 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9411 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.935 |
2012-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09411 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6319