NY S06320 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a conspicuous memorandum regarding the disruption of vital services for residents of the New York city housing authority detailing a process and timeframe such residents can report such disruption for inspection.
Title
Requires a conspicuous memorandum regarding the disruption of vital services for residents of the New York city housing authority detailing a process and timeframe such residents can report such disruption for inspection.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.43 |
2019-12-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.652 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.674 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8019a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1446 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6320A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08019 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.43