NY S06322 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of the department of corrections and community supervision to undertake a study of the surveillance, prevention, treatment and prevalence of hepatitis C among the inmate population.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of the department of corrections and community supervision to undertake a study of the surveillance, prevention, treatment and prevalence of hepatitis C among the inmate population.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.429
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.48
2018-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a8340
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1144
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2017-06-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A08340 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s6322

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback