NY S06329 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the expiration of provisions amending the executive law relating to quarterly claim reports for certain disaster assistance.
Title
Relates to the expiration of provisions amending the executive law relating to quarterly claim reports for certain disaster assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.713 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.204 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7926 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1371 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07926 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.713