NY S06331 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the green jobs-green New York on-bill energy efficiency payment program.
Title
Relates to the green jobs-green New York on-bill energy efficiency payment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.329 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1709 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08277 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to energy