NY S06334 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses prerequisites to a class action; an order allowing class action and appointing class counsel; the voluntary dismissal, discontinuance, compromise or settlement of a class action and attorneys' fees.
Title
Addresses prerequisites to a class action; an order allowing class action and appointing class counsel; the voluntary dismissal, discontinuance, compromise or settlement of a class action and attorneys' fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.404 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6334A |
2019-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08034 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.288