NY S06335 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the rules of evidence to permit the admission of an opposing party's statement if made by an agent or employee made within the scope of that relationship.
Title
Amends the rules of evidence to permit the admission of an opposing party's statement if made by an agent or employee made within the scope of that relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1710 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07599 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.281