NY S06339 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8083A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8083A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop guidelines for vegetation management plans to be used by persons or corporations that make claims that they provide pollinator protection.
Title
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop guidelines for vegetation management plans to be used by persons or corporations that make claims that they provide pollinator protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8083A |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.668 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6339A |
2018-02-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A08083 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - approval memo.9