NY S06343 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to theft of services from barbershops, salons or beauty salons and makes such offense a violation.
Title
Relates to theft of services from barbershops, salons or beauty salons and makes such offense a violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.275 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.233 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10574 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1319 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6343A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04761 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A10574 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6343a
A10574 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6343a