NY S06345 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing that a special patrol officer of the county of Oswego need not be a resident of such county.
Title
Relates to providing that a special patrol officer of the county of Oswego need not be a resident of such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.645 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8155 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1794 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08155 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.645