NY S06347 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sealing petty offenses and making certain technical changes.
Title
Relates to sealing petty offenses and making certain technical changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.359 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1527 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6347 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.455 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7584 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1527 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07584 (Same As) 2019-10-07 - signed chap.359