NY S06352 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a foreign corporation's application for authority to do business in this state constitutes consent to jurisdiction of the courts of this state and a surrender of such application constitutes withdrawal of such consent.
Title
Provides that a foreign corporation's application for authority to do business in this state constitutes consent to jurisdiction of the courts of this state and a surrender of such application constitutes withdrawal of such consent.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1450 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07595 (Same As) 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules