NY S06353 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.430
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to penalties and enforcement in the Long Island Pine Barrens maritime reserve; authorizes a police officer or peace officer to impound any all-terrain vehicle provided that such seizure is conducted pursuant to the vehicle and traffic law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to penalties and enforcement in the Long Island Pine Barrens maritime reserve; authorizes a police officer or peace officer to impound any all-terrain vehicle provided that such seizure is conducted pursuant to the vehicle and traffic law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.430
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.464
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11112
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6353A
2018-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1264
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A11112 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6353a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06353&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06353&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06353
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06353&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06353A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6353#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6353#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6353#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06353&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback