NY S06357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the the Central Pine Barrens area and the core preservation area; amends the legal description of such areas.
Title
Relates to the the Central Pine Barrens area and the core preservation area; amends the legal description of such areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.29 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.584 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1833 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6357 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.228 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8135 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1833 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08135 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.29