NY S06360 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - signed chap.133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - signed chap.133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an exception to firearm storage requirements related to persons less than sixteen years old when such person less than sixteen years old is at a shooting range under immediate supervision, or when such person less than sixteen years old is the holder of a hunting license or permit.
Title
Provides for an exception to firearm storage requirements related to persons less than sixteen years old when such person less than sixteen years old is at a shooting range under immediate supervision, or when such person less than sixteen years old is the holder of a hunting license or permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | signed chap.133 |
2019-07-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1585 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6360 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.310 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | rules report cal.310 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8174 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1585 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08174 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - signed chap.133