NY S06361 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires informational materials regarding the use of opioid antagonists for first aid or emergency treatment to provide information of the application of good samaritan laws to protect against liability.
Title
Requires informational materials regarding the use of opioid antagonists for first aid or emergency treatment to provide information of the application of good samaritan laws to protect against liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.504 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1328 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6361 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.362 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-18 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7277 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1328 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07277 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.504