NY S06368 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to develop informational materials concerning menstrual disorders for distribution in schools and to patients.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to develop informational materials concerning menstrual disorders for distribution in schools and to patients.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.534 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1454 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6368 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.318 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A484 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1454 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00484 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534