NY S06369 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tax credits for premiums paid for life insurance which is used for long term health care.
Title
Establishes tax credits for premiums paid for life insurance which is used for long term health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.303 |
2016-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.232 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a8703 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1175 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08703 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6369