NY S06374 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the presidential primary, to provide for the election of delegates to a national party convention or a national party conference in 2020; establishes the "Presidential" primary date as April 28, 2020.
Title
Relates to the presidential primary, to provide for the election of delegates to a national party convention or a national party conference in 2020; establishes the "Presidential" primary date as April 28, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.4 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.290 |
2019-09-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8176 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1455 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08176 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.4