NY S06375 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an additional 0.25% mortgage recording tax in Livingston county and brings the total mortgage recording tax in Livingston county to 1.25%.
Title
Imposes an additional 0.25% mortgage recording tax in Livingston county and brings the total mortgage recording tax in Livingston county to 1.25%.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.373 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.606 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8006a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1529 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08006 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.373