NY S06377 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.433
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.433
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Names a section of route 8 between the Susquehanna River and interstate eighty-eight in the village of Sidney the "Sidney Veterans' Memorial Highway".
Title
Names a section of route 8 between the Susquehanna River and interstate eighty-eight in the village of Sidney the "Sidney Veterans' Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.433 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.477 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8223a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1712 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6377A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08223 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.433