NY S06384 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the exceptions to certain effluent limitations in Nassau and Suffolk counties and requires certain eligible projects for state aid involving water pollution control revolving fund agreements to take county-wide or regional wastewater planning into consideration when determining eligibility.
Title
Limits the exceptions to certain effluent limitations in Nassau and Suffolk counties and requires certain eligible projects for state aid involving water pollution control revolving fund agreements to take county-wide or regional wastewater planning into consideration when determining eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1456 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08124 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES