NY S06386 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage American eel.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage American eel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.235 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.199 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7882 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1273 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07882 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.235