NY S06392 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates all that portion of the state highway system constituting state route sixty-three in the town of North Dansville, county of Livingston, as the "North Dansville Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates all that portion of the state highway system constituting state route sixty-three in the town of North Dansville, county of Livingston, as the "North Dansville Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08156 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.283