NY S06393 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage hickory shad.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage hickory shad.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.237 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.225 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a8055 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1275 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08055 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.237